8 Vaidic Maths Trick For Fast Calculation| Do Long Calculations Rapidly - GMS - Learning Simply
Students' favourite free learning app with LIVE online classes, instant doubt resolution, unlimited practice for classes 6-12, personalized study app for Maths, Science, Social Studies, video e-learning, online tutorial, and more. Join Telegram

8 Vaidic Maths Trick For Fast Calculation| Do Long Calculations Rapidly

If you are a CBSE/ICSE student wondering how to do fast calculations and increase your efficiency in exams, this post is for you.
Please wait 0 seconds...
Scroll Down and click on Go to Link for destination
Congrats! Link is Generated

Vaidic Ganit Tricks For Fast Calculations - Tricks, Sutras & Examples

Vaidic Ganit Tricks For Fast Calculations - Tricks, Sutras & Examples
Vaidic Ganit Tricks For Fast Calculations - Tricks, Sutras & Examples

Vedic Maths Tricks to Calculate Faster

For some students, Math can be quite a tricky subject to master, especially when unaware of the best Vedic Maths tricks. Before we tell you about these, do you know what Vedic Math is? It is an ancient collection of sutras that can help students solve Math problems super-quickly. 

If you are a CBSE/ICSE student wondering how to do fast calculations and increase your efficiency in exams, this post is for you. Read ahead to know about our top-picked Vedic Maths shortcuts: 

Must-know Vedic Maths Tricks 

Vedic Maths Tip 1: Finding the Square of a Two-Digit Number That Ends with Five 

This tip is among the top Math tricks every student must know. Let us take an example. Imagine you need to find the answer to this: (25) ² =? 

For this, here are the steps: 

Step 1: 25 x 25 = __25 (the answer will always end with 25) 

Step 2: Now, you need to multiply the first digit of the two-digit number by (the first digit+1) to find the term for the blank. In this case, it is 2x (2+1). The answer to this is 6. 

Hence the answer to (25) ² = 625. 

Easy isn’t it? Now, try finding the square of 55 and 75. 

Vedic Math Tip 2: Multiplying Any Number by Five 

For this tip, you need to consider if the number is even or odd. Once you determine this, do the following: 

For Even Numbers 

Let us take the following example for this: 

2244 x 5 =?

Step 1: Divide the number by two. This makes 2244 / 2 = 1122 

Step 2: Add a zero to the calculation above, and you will get the answer: 11220. 

Thus, 2244 x 5 = 11220 

For Odd Numbers 

Let us take the following example for this: 

2245 x 5 =? 

Step 1: For this, follow the formula: (Number – 1) / 2. 

For the above example, this will be (2245 – 1)/2 = 1122 

Step 2: Now, instead of zero, you need to put five at the end, and you will get the answer 11225. 

Thus, 2245 x 5 = 11225 

Now that you know these Vedic Maths tricks, try finding the answer to 1356 x 5 and 455 x 5 using the same. 

Vedic Math Tip 3: Subtracting Anything from 1000, 10000, or 100000 

If you are weak in calculations and want to know how to calculate fast in mind, this tip is for you. An example for this will be: 

1000 – 423 =? 

For this Vedic Math tricks, subtract the first two digits in the number 423 from the nine and the last from ten. The steps will be as follows: 

Step 1: 9 – 4 = 5 

Step 2: 9 – 2 = 7 

Step 3: 10 – 3 = 7 

Now, simply write all the answers in each step together, and you get your final answer, 577. 

Thus, 1000 – 423 = 577. 

Now, use the same tip to solve the following: 

1000 – 346 =? 

10,000 – 1087 =? 

1000 – 827 =? 

10,000 – 1579 =? 

Vedic Math Tip 4: Multiplying Any Two-Digit Numbers Between 11 to 19 

For students who are searching for Vedic Maths Tricks for competitive exams, this tip is super-useful. The example we will take for this is: 12 x 15 =? 

Step 1: Firstly, you need to add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger one. It means 15 + 2 = 17. 

Step 2: Now, take the above result and multiply it by 10. 

17 x 10 = 170 

Step 3: After this, take the unit digits of both the numbers in the question and multiply them.  

Here, this would be: 

2 x 5 = 10 

Step 4: Lastly, add the result in steps 2 and 3. With this, you get the answer: 170 + 10 = 180. 

Thus, 12 x 15 = 180 

Now, use Vedic maths tricks to solve the following: 19 x 18 =? 

Vedic Math Tip 5: Dividing A Large Number by Five 

Let us take the following example: 245 / 5 =? 

To solve this, follow these steps: 

Step 1: Multiply the number to be divided by two. 

Here, 245 x 2 = 490 

Step 2: Now, you need to move the decimal point to the left, and you have the answer. This makes it 49.0 or just 49. 

Thus, 245 / 5 = 49. 

If you understand this method, try solving 3349 / 2. 

Vedic Math Tip 6: Multiplying A Two-digit Number by Eleven 

Let us explain this by solving what is 32 x 11? 

For this, simply place the two-digit number according to this formula and add the center part: 

Answer = (First digit of the number (First digit of the number + second digit of the number) First digit of the number) 

Thus, this makes it: 32 x 11 = 3 (3+2) 2. 

The answer you will get here is 352. 

Thus, 32 x 11 = 352. 

Now try this tip to answer what is 96 x 11? 

Vedic Math Tip 7: Multiplying Three-digit Numbers 

Let us say you want to find the answer to 306 x 308 =? For this, do the following: 

Step 1: Start with subtracting the unit place digit from the actual numbers. 

Thus, 308 – 8 = 300 and 306 – 6 = 300. 

Step 2: Now, choose any number out of the two and add it to the unit digit of the other number. If we take 308, this will be 308 + 6 = 314. 

Step 3: Then, multiply the results of steps 1 and 2, and you will get 314 × 300 = 94200. 

Step 4: After this, calculate the product of the unit digits of both the numbers. Here, 8 × 6 = 48. 

Step 5: Lastly, add the results of steps 3 and 4 to get the answer. Here, 94200 + 48 = 94248. 

Thus, 306 x 308 = 94248. 

Simple, isn’t it? Now, use this method to find the answer to 808 x 508 =? 

Vedic Math Tip 8: Finding the Square Value of a Number 

Let us suppose you need an answer for (99)² =? 

For this, the steps are: 

Step 1: Firstly, you need a base closer to the number in the question. Here, it can be 100. 

Step 2: Now, calculate the difference of the number from the base. It means 99 – 100 = -1. 

Step 3: After this, add this difference to the number. Here, 99 + (-1) = 98. 

Step 4: Then, multiply the result you get above with the base: 98 x 100 = 9800 

Step 5: Lastly, add the product of the square of the difference with the result in step 4 to get the final answer. Here, 9800 + (-1) ² = 9801. 

Thus, (99) ² = 9801. 

Do you want to practice more? Try solving this: (102) ² =? 

Conclusion 

So, these are the top 8 Best Vedic Maths Tricks with examples. All of these will help you get through your Math exams and come in handy when you appear for any competitive exam. They are the best way to increase your efficiency during exams.  

With these, you will be able to solve most of the problems within no time. Sure, these may seem a bit tricky, but all you need is regular practice, and you will be able to use them in no time. Good luck! 

We can make it something like feel like a magician by knowing these 8 Vedic maths tricks.

About the Author

At the helm of GMS Learning is Principal Balkishan Agrawal, a dedicated and experienced educationist. Under his able guidance, our school has flourished academically and has achieved remarkable milestones in various fields. Principal Agrawal’s visio…

Post a Comment

Cookie Consent
We serve cookies on this site to analyze traffic, remember your preferences, and optimize your experience.
Oops!
It seems there is something wrong with your internet connection. Please connect to the internet and start browsing again.
AdBlock Detected!
We have detected that you are using adblocking plugin in your browser.
The revenue we earn by the advertisements is used to manage this website, we request you to whitelist our website in your adblocking plugin.
Site is Blocked
Sorry! This site is not available in your country.